SB23
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 05, 2008.
By: Health and Education

Revises provisions governing certain organizational matters within the Department of Health and Human Services. (BDR 18-328)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 78.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Education     Feb. 04, 2009     03:15 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Feb. 16, 2009     03:15 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 16, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Government Affairs     May. 08, 2009     10:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Feb. 20   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May. 12   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Dec 05, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer.

Dec 08, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 17, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Feb 18, 2009

  • Read second time.

Feb 19, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Feb 20, 2009

Feb 23, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 08, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 12, 2009

May 15, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 17, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 18, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 78.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.