SB177
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 09, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Raggio , Nolan , Townsend , Washington , Cegavske , Amodei , Care , Coffin , Copening , Horsford , Lee , McGinness , Parks , Rhoads , Wiener

Requires the Department of Taxation to create on the Internet a searchable database of certain tax rates in this State. (BDR 32-929)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Mar. 17, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 09, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Apr. 29, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May. 02, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.411   

Bill History

Mar 09, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 10, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 15, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 411.)
  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 16, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)