SB180
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 09, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy

Makes various changes relating to the licensing and inspection of dental X-ray machines. (BDR 54-770)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 25, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 09, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 10, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)