AB255
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 06, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Leslie

Increases the tax on tobacco products and provides for use of the additional tax proceeds to expand certain health care delivery programs. (BDR 32-812)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Mar. 17, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Taxation     Apr. 07, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Without recommendation, and rerefer

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 06, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 09, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)