SB24
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 05, 2008.
By: Health and Education

Requires the Director of the Department of Health and Human Services, within the limits of available money, to include in the State Plan for Medicaid a program to provide preliminary determinations of eligibility for certain assistance. (BDR 38-450)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Education     Feb. 11, 2009     03:15 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 23, 2009     03:15 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Apr. 27, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Apr. 29, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May. 12, 2009     07:00 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May. 27, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Rerefer

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 01   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.136   

Bill History

Dec 05, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer.

Dec 08, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 19, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 08, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 13, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 136.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Apr 30, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

May 01, 2009

May 02, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 28, 2009

  • From committee: Rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)