SB185
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 09, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Copening , Parks , Wiener , Breeden , Coffin , Hardy , Lee , Mathews , Woodhouse , Bobzien , Aizley , Hogan , Mastroluca , Munford

Requires school districts to use certain environmentally sensitive cleaning and maintenance products. (BDR 34-742)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 244.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 25, 2009     02:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 31, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 07, 2009     05:00 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     May. 04, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Education     May. 06, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 15, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 16   Yea 18,   Nay 3,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 18   Yea 29,   Nay 13,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.258   

Bill History

Mar 09, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer.

Mar 10, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 15, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 258.) To printer.

Apr 16, 2009

Apr 17, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 12, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 13, 2009

  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2009

May 19, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 20, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 244.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.