SB186
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 09, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Copening , Parks , Amodei , Coffin , Hardy , Lee , Rhoads , Woodhouse , Pierce , Segerblom , Goedhart , Manendo , Mastroluca

Provides for the issuance of permits for the operation of facilities for the management of waste tires. (BDR 40-739)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 260.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 16, 2009     03:15 PM    Minutes          Rerefer
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr. 07, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr. 09, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr. 29, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 17   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 19   Yea 29,   Nay 12,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.392   

Bill History

Mar 09, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer.

Mar 10, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 16, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Mar 17, 2009

  • From committee: Rerefer to Committee on Natural Resources.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee.

Apr 16, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 392.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2009

Apr 20, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 01, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 02, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 05, 2009

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 18, 2009

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 19, 2009

May 20, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 260.
  • Effective May 28, 2009 for the purpose of adopting regulations, and October 1, 2009, for all other purposes.