SB187
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 09, 2009.
By: Finance

Makes an appropriation to Ridge House, Inc., for reintegration services and counseling for persons released from facilities of the Department of Corrections. (BDR S-629)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Mar. 23, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Apr. 10, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 09, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Mar 10, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)