SB26
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 05, 2008.
By: Commerce and Labor

Revises provisions governing chiropractic physicians. (BDR 54-349)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 252.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Feb. 16, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 04, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 04, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 15, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 20, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 15   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 19   Yea 32,   Nay 9,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.39     Amend. No.776   

Bill History

Dec 05, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Dec 08, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 08, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 13, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 39.) To printer.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2009

Apr 16, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 18, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 776.) To printer.

May 19, 2009

May 20, 2009

  • In Senate.

May 21, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 776 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 252.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.