SB188
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 09, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Schneider

Provides for the establishment of the Solar Thermal Systems Demonstration Program. (BDR 58-379)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 414.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Mar. 13, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 07, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May. 04, 2009     04:00 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May. 19, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 21, 2009     12:00 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 19   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 27   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.238     Amend. No.910   

Bill History

Mar 09, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer.

Mar 10, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 13, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 14, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 238.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .

Apr 15, 2009

  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 19, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

May 20, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 27, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 910.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.)
  • To printer.

May 28, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.

May 29, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 910 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 03, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 414.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.