SB190
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 10, 2009.
By: Government Affairs

Revises provisions regarding the acquisition and disposal of real property by fair and recreation boards in certain larger counties. (BDR 20-648)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 415.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar. 16, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar. 18, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     May. 02, 2009     10:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Government Affairs     May. 12, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Government Affairs     May. 27, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 08   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 20   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May. 22   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.74     Amend. No.668     Amend. No.916   

Bill History

Mar 10, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 11, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 01, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 02, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 74.) To printer.

Apr 03, 2009

Apr 06, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 08, 2009

Apr 09, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 668.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.)
  • Notice of reconsideration on next legislative day.
  • To printer.

May 21, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Action reconsidered.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 22, 2009

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 916.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.)
  • To printer.

May 23, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.

May 28, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment Nos. 668 and 916 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 29, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 03, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 415.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.