SB193
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 10, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Mathews

Revises provisions governing dealers in antiques. (BDR 54-1069)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 208.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 23, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 08, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 11, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 13, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 15, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 15   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May. 18   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 10, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 11, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 14, 2009

  • Read second time.

Apr 15, 2009

Apr 16, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 18, 2009

May 19, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 20, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 208.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.