SB195
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 10, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Carlton

Revises provisions governing workers' compensation. (BDR 53-1077)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 500.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 18, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Mar. 23, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 29, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 13, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 20, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 20   Yea 13,   Nay 7,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 19   Yea 27,   Nay 14,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Votes in Response to Governor's Veto  (2/3 Majority Required)
   Senate Override (Not Sustain)    (2nd Reprint)       May. 31   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Override (Not Sustain)    (2nd Reprint)       May. 31   Yea 28,   Nay 14,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.462     Amend. No.717   

Bill History

Mar 10, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 11, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 26, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 462.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 7, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 21, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 18, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 717.) To printer.

May 19, 2009

May 20, 2009

  • In Senate.

May 21, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 717 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Vetoed by the Governor. Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message.

May 31, 2009

Jun 01, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • Chapter 500.
  • Sections 3 and 17 effective May 31, 2009. Sections 11 to 14, inclusive, and 16 effective July 1, 2009. Sections 1, 1.5, 2, 4 to 10, inclusive, and 15 effective October 1, 2009.