SB196
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 10, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Care

Revises the provision that restricts petitions for initiative or referendum to a single subject. (BDR 24-83)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar. 17, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr. 07, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr. 09, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 10, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 11, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)