SB197
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 10, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Wiener , Parks , Copening , Woodhouse , Breeden , Amodei , Cegavske , Hardy , Horsford , Lee , McGinness , Nolan , Washington

Revises provisions relating to the reissuance of certain prescription drugs. (BDR 39-804)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 261.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 16, 2009     03:15 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 24, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 01, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 15, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Education     May. 22, 2009     12:30 AM    Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 08   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 20   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.94     Amend. No.780   

Bill History

Mar 10, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer.

Mar 11, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 02, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 94.) To printer.

Apr 07, 2009

Apr 08, 2009

Apr 09, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 780.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

May 21, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.

May 22, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 780 concurred in. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 261.
  • Sections 1, 2, 3, 6 and 8 effective May 28, 2009 for the purposes of adopting regulations and on October 1, 2009, for all other purposes. Sections 4, 5 and 7 effective October 1, 2009.