AB277
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 10, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Anderson , McClain , Leslie , Aizley , Atkinson , Bobzien , Carpenter , Conklin , Denis , Dondero Loop , Horne , Kihuen , Kirkpatrick , Manendo , Mortenson , Munford , Oceguera , Ohrenschall , Parnell , Pierce , Segerblom , Smith

Makes various changes concerning the excise tax on liquor. (BDR 32-204)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Mar. 17, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Taxation     Apr. 07, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Without recommendation, and rerefer

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 10, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 11, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 09, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)