SB201
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 11, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Amodei , Washington , Townsend , Horsford , McGinness , Nolan , Raggio , Schneider , Buckley , Smith , Atkinson , Anderson , Bobzien , Gansert , Leslie , Oceguera , Parnell

Authorizes certain counties to impose additional taxes on fuels for motor vehicles. (BDR 32-233)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 501.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Mar. 26, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 02, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 22, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 30, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Transportation     May. 12, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Taxation     May. 15, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          After Passage Discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May. 06   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May. 15   Yea 34,   Nay 5,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0

Votes in Response to Governor's Veto  (2/3 Majority Required)
   Senate Override (Not Sustain)     (As Introduced)    May. 30   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Override (Not Sustain)     (As Introduced)    Jun. 01   Yea 35,   Nay 6,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0

Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 11, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 12, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2009

  • Waiver granted effective: April 3, 2009.

May 01, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 02, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 04, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 05, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 06, 2009

May 08, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 13, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 15, 2009

May 16, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 18, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 21, 2009

  • Vetoed by the Governor.

May 26, 2009

  • Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message.

May 30, 2009

  • Made Special Order of Business for Saturday, May 30, 2009, at 6:42 p.m.
  • Bill read. Veto not sustained. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.)
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.

Jun 01, 2009

Jun 02, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • Chapter 501.
  • Effective June 1, 2009.