AJR5
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 11, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Mortenson , Ohrenschall , Horne , Kihuen , Segerblom

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to revise provisions governing the convening and conduct of special sessions and the duration and adjournment of regular and special sessions. (BDR C-139)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
File No. 92.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Mar. 19, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr. 09, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 05, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 14, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 14   Yea 28,   Nay 13,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 22   Yea 17,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.757   

Bill History

Mar 11, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer.

Mar 12, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 10, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 13, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 14, 2009

Apr 15, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 21, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 757.) To printer.

May 22, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. Preamble adopted, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) To Assembly.

May 23, 2009

  • In Assembly.

May 26, 2009

  • Senate Amendment No. 757 concurred in. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • File No. 92.
  • Return to 2011 Session.