AB295
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 11, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Settelmeyer , McClain , Christensen , Anderson , Bobzien , Carpenter , Cobb , Conklin , Gansert , Goedhart , Goicoechea , Grady , Gustavson , Hambrick , Hardy , Horne , Kihuen , Kirkpatrick , Koivisto , Manendo , Mortenson , Oceguera , Segerblom , Spiegel , Stewart , Woodbury , Amodei , Cegavske , Hardy , Lee , Parks , Woodhouse

Allows a person who qualifies as both a veteran and the surviving spouse of a veteran to claim both veterans' exemptions from property taxes and governmental services taxes. (BDR 32-572)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Mar. 19, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar. 27, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr. 06, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 11, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 12, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 20, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read second time.

Mar 24, 2009

  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Mar 30, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)