SB202
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 11, 2009.
By: Taxation

Provides the legislative approval required for an increase in the tax imposed pursuant to the Clark County Sales and Use Tax Act of 2005. (BDR S-452)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Mar. 31, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 07, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.264     Amend. No.557   

Bill History

Mar 11, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 12, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 264 and 557.)
  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 22, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)