SB204
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 11, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Rhoads

Revises provisions governing notice of an application for a permit to appropriate water. (BDR 48-1086)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Natural Resources     Mar. 24, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Natural Resources     Mar. 31, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 29, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Not Heard

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 13   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.172   

Bill History

Mar 11, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Mar 12, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 08, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 172.) To printer.

Apr 09, 2009

Apr 13, 2009

Apr 14, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)