SB206
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 11, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Lee

Establishes provisions governing the construction and operation of certain toll roads. (BDR 35-1091)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Mar. 19, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Apr. 03, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Transportation     May. 14, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 16   Yea 15,   Nay 6,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.199   

Bill History

Mar 11, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer.

Mar 12, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 15, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 199.) To printer.

Apr 16, 2009

Apr 17, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)