AB317
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 12, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Oceguera

Provides for the disbursement of a portion of the proceeds of the state tax imposed on certain businesses to regional organizations for economic development. (BDR 32-616)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 448.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Mar. 26, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended and rerefer
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 14, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 29, 2009     07:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May. 31, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     Jun. 01, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 30   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       Jun. 01   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.143     Amend. No.972     Amend. No.1005   

Bill History

Mar 12, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 13, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 16, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Amended Notice of Exemption: Eligible for Exemption.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 143.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

May 30, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 972.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

Jun 01, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1005.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 1005 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 448.
  • Effective July 1, 2009, and expires by limitation June 30, 2011.