SB259
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cegavske

Establishes a temporary program for the alternative licensure of teachers. (BDR 34-679)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 27, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 08, 2009     02:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 21   Yea 11,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.447   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer.

Mar 17, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 447.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Apr 20, 2009

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 21, 2009

Apr 22, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)