SB48
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 05, 2008.
By: Taxation

Repeals certain requirements regarding the delivery of cigarettes sold to consumers. (BDR 32-270)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 60.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Taxation     Feb. 17, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Taxation     Mar. 17, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Taxation     Apr. 21, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Not Heard
  Assembly Taxation     Apr. 28, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar. 25   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May. 02   Yea 39,   Nay 0,   Excused 3,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Dec 05, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Dec 08, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 23, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 24, 2009

  • Read second time.

Mar 25, 2009

Mar 27, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

Apr 29, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 01, 2009

  • Read second time.

May 02, 2009

May 04, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 05, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 11, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 60.
  • Effective May 11, 2009.