SB49
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 05, 2008.
By: Commerce and Labor

Creates a requirement for a written contract between a client and an architect, registered interior designer or residential designer under certain circumstances. (BDR 54-353)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 80.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Feb. 04, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 15, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May. 01, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 08   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 06   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.1   

Bill History

Dec 05, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Dec 08, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 26, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Mar 30, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1.) To printer.

Mar 31, 2009

Apr 01, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 02, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 08, 2009

Apr 09, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 05, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 06, 2009

May 08, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 13, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 18, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 80.
  • Effective May 18, 2009.