SB52
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 05, 2008.
By: Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation

Revises provisions relating to drivers' licenses and identification cards. (BDR 43-391)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Feb. 12, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Feb. 17, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Feb. 24, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     Mar. 16, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Mar. 27, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     May. 01, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes      Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     May. 14, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     Jun. 01, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun. 01   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.1003   

Bill History

Dec 05, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer.

Dec 08, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 25, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Feb 26, 2009

  • Read second time.

Mar 02, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Mar 04, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

Mar 16, 2009

  • Notice of exemption.

May 15, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 31, 2009

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Taken from General File. Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

Jun 01, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1003.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)