SB53
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 05, 2008.
By: Government Affairs

Makes various changes relating to the Office of the Secretary of State. (BDR 18-415)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 253.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb. 16, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Feb. 23, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb. 23, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 27, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     Apr. 29, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Government Affairs     May. 08, 2009     10:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned
  Assembly Government Affairs     May. 13, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 08   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 20   Yea 28,   Nay 14,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.11   

Bill History

Dec 05, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Dec 08, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 24, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 02, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 11.) To printer.

Apr 07, 2009

Apr 08, 2009

Apr 09, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 13, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 15, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2009

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 20, 2009

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) To Senate.

May 21, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 253.
  • Sections 1 to 16, inclusive, and section 19 effective May 28, 2009 for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of sections 2 to 16, inclusive, and July 1, 2009, for all other purposes. Sections 17 and 18 effective July 1, 2009.