SB55
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 05, 2008.
By: Judiciary

Makes various changes concerning commercial recordings. (BDR 7-413)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 488.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 11, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 26, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 24, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 30, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May. 26, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do not concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 06   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 20   Yea 28,   Nay 14,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.15     Amend. No.588     Amend. No.CA15   

Bill History

Dec 05, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 08, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 01, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 02, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 15.) To printer.

Apr 03, 2009

Apr 06, 2009

Apr 09, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 588.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.)
  • To printer.

May 21, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.

May 28, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 588 not concurred in. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 588 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

May 31, 2009

  • From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 588 and further amend.
  • Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • Conference report adopted by Assembly.

Jun 01, 2009

  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 09, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 488.
  • Sections 15.5, 16.2, 16.6, 55.5 and 56 effective June 9, 2009. Sections 1 to 14, inclusive, 16 and 17 to 53.5, inclusive, effective July 1, 2009. Sections 16.4 and 16.8 effective July 1, 2011. Sections 16.2 and 16.6 expire by limitation June 30, 2011.