AB22
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 05, 2008.
By: Commerce and Labor

Revises provisions relating to certain trade practices. (BDR 52-428)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Nevada Constitution, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb. 09, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 13, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 15, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 21   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 21   Yea 18,   Nay 3,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Votes in Response to Governor's Veto  (2/3 Majority Required)
   Assembly Override (Not Sustain)    (2nd Reprint)       May. 31   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Override (Not Sustain)    (2nd Reprint)       Jun. 01   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.428     Amend. No.769   

Bill History

Dec 05, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Dec 07, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 428.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

Apr 22, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 769.) To printer.

May 21, 2009

May 22, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 769 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 23, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2009

  • Vetoed by the Governor.

May 30, 2009

  • Returned to Assembly.

May 31, 2009

Jun 01, 2009

  • Made Special Order of Business for Monday, June 1, 2009, at 7:08 p.m.
  • Bill read. Veto sustained. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.)
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • (Pursuant to Nevada Constitution, no further action allowed.)