AB23
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 05, 2008.
By: Taxation

Revises provisions governing the crediting and refunding of overpayments of certain taxes and fees. (BDR 32-346)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 33.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Feb. 17, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Not Heard
  Assembly Taxation     Feb. 24, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Taxation     Mar. 12, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Taxation     Apr. 23, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar. 17   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 29   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Dec 05, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Dec 07, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 13, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read second time.

Mar 17, 2009

Mar 19, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

Apr 24, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 28, 2009

  • Read second time.

Apr 29, 2009

May 01, 2009

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 02, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 06, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 33.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.