SB304
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks , Copening , Horsford , Carlton , Coffin , Schneider , Wiener , Pierce , Leslie , Smith

Revises provisions relating to tests for certain communicable diseases. (BDR 40-844)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 87.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 27, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 31, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May. 04, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 15   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 06   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.170   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 08, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 13, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 170.) To printer.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 15, 2009

Apr 16, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 05, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 06, 2009

May 08, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 13, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 18, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 87.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.