SB305
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks , Copening , Horsford , Carlton , Coffin , Schneider , Pierce , Leslie , Mastroluca , Smith

Makes various changes concerning dispensing a medication and providing a prescription for the sexual partner of a person diagnosed with a sexually transmitted disease. (BDR 40-845)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 27, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 31, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May. 04, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May. 13, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Education     May. 21, 2009     08:20 PM    Minutes          Do not concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 17   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 20   Yea 39,   Nay 3,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.171     Amend. No.804   

Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer.

Mar 18, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 15, 2009

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 16, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 171.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2009

Apr 20, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 18, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 19, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 804.) To printer.

May 20, 2009

May 21, 2009

  • In Senate.

May 22, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 804 not concurred in. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 804 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.
  • In Senate.

May 23, 2009

  • Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)