AB24
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 05, 2008.
By: Commerce and Labor

Enacts provisions governing certain claims for compensation under industrial insurance. (BDR 53-423)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 483.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb. 09, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 01, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 27, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do not recede

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 21   Yea 27,   Nay 14,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 12   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.429     Amend. No.599     Amend. No.CA31   

Bill History

Dec 05, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Dec 07, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 429.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

Apr 22, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 06, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 08, 2009

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

May 11, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 599.) To printer.

May 12, 2009

May 13, 2009

  • In Assembly.

May 20, 2009

  • Senate Amendment No. 599 not concurred in. To Senate.
  • In Senate.

May 28, 2009

  • Senate Amendment No. 599 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.

May 29, 2009

  • Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.

Jun 01, 2009

  • From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 599 and further amend. Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • Conference report adopted by Senate.

Jun 02, 2009

  • To printer.

Jun 03, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 04, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 09, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 483.
  • Effective June 9, 2009, for the purpose of adopting regulations and October 1, 2009, for all other purposes.