AB469
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 16, 2009.
By: Ways and Means

Revises provisions governing unemployment compensation. (BDR 53-1275)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 8.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Mar. 18, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar. 18, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar. 23, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 01, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     May. 08, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          After Passage Discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar. 27   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr. 08   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Mar 17, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 23, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 24, 2009

  • Read second time.

Mar 27, 2009

Mar 30, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

Apr 02, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Read second time.

Apr 08, 2009

Apr 09, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • To enrollment.

Apr 14, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Apr 16, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 8.
  • Effective April 16, 2009. Sections 2 and 3 of this act expire by limitation on January 1, 2010, or the date that federal sharing is no longer authorized pursuant to section 2005(a) of Public Law No. 111-5, whichever is later.