AB30
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 05, 2008.
By: Taxation

Revises provisions governing the granting by the Commission on Economic Development of a partial abatement of certain taxes on a new or expanded business in this State. (BDR 32-458)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Feb. 24, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Dec 05, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Dec 07, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)