AB489
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Education

Revises provisions governing charter schools. (BDR 34-297)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Mar. 20, 2009     12:01 PM    Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Education     Apr. 01, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 01, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 08, 2009     02:30 PM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Education     Apr. 08, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.334   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 334.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)