AB181
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 16, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Smith , Horne , Parnell , Anderson , Atkinson , Conklin , Gansert , Kirkpatrick , Mastroluca , Mortenson , Oceguera , Pierce , Spiegel

Revises provisions governing charter schools. (BDR 34-550)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Mar. 30, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Education     Apr. 08, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Education     May. 08, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     May. 14, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 17   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 22   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.304     Amend. No.740   

Bill History

Feb 16, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Feb 17, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 17, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 304.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To committee.

May 18, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 19, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 740.) To printer.

May 20, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 21, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2009

May 23, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 740 not concurred in. To Senate.

May 26, 2009

  • In Senate.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)