SB366
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Commerce and Labor

Revises provisions relating to workers' compensation. (BDR 53-590)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 08, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)