SB378
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Health and Education

Establishes provisions relating to certain early childhood education programs. (BDR 34-1134)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Bill read. Veto sustained. (Yeas: None, Nays: 21.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 03, 2009     01:00 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 06, 2009     02:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 08, 2009     02:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and rerefer
  Senate Finance     Apr. 27, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     Apr. 29, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Without recommendation as amended
  Assembly Education     May. 06, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Health and Education     May. 20, 2009     02:15 PM    Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 01   Yea 15,   Nay 5,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 19   Yea 27,   Nay 14,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 31   Yea 0,   Nay 21,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.452     Amend. No.618   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and rerefer to Committee on Finance.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 452.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Apr 30, 2009

  • From committee: Without recommendation, as amended.

May 01, 2009

May 02, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 12, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 13, 2009

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 18, 2009

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 618.) To printer.

May 19, 2009

May 20, 2009

  • In Senate.

May 21, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 618 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 22, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 28, 2009

  • Vetoed by the Governor. Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message.

May 31, 2009