SB381
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Health and Education

Revises provisions governing the immunization of children against certain diseases. (BDR 38-809)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 03, 2009     01:00 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 08, 2009     02:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and rerefer
  Senate Finance     May. 04, 2009     04:00 PM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.453   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and rerefer to Committee on Finance.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 453.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)