SB383
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Health and Education

Requires certain warnings regarding the use of certain tobacco products. (BDR 40-1104)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 06, 2009     02:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 08, 2009     02:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 12, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Do Pass, failed

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 17   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.454   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 454.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2009

Apr 20, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 16, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)