SB385
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Health and Education

Revises provisions governing charter schools. (BDR 34-279)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Apr. 01, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 01, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 08, 2009     02:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Education     May. 06, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Without recommendation, and rerefer
  Senate Health and Education     May. 14, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 27, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Apr. 21   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.455     Amend. No.551   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 02, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 455.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.
  • Action of rereferral rescinded.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 551.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Apr 22, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 12, 2009

  • From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)