AB521
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Commerce and Labor

Revises provisions governing coverage for cancer as an occupational disease of firefighters. (BDR 53-278)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 487.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 23, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 06, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 08, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 29, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     May. 13, 2009     12:30 PM    Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     May. 20, 2009     04:00 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Finance     May. 28, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 20   Yea 29,   Nay 13,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 30   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.282     Amend. No.970     Amend. No.971   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 282.) Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. To printer.

Apr 16, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 20, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 13.) To Senate.

Apr 21, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 15, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2009

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 29, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 970 and 971.) To printer.

May 30, 2009

May 31, 2009

  • Senate Amendment Nos. 970 and 971 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 09, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 487.
  • Effective July 1, 2009.