AB522
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Commerce and Labor

Makes various changes relating to energy. (BDR 58-1139)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 377.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar. 23, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 01, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 01, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 06, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Without recommendation, and rerefer
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 12, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Not Heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 13, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Not Heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 14, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Not Heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 15, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May. 22, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     May. 23, 2009     01:00 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 22   Yea 39,   Nay 1,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 28   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.930     Amend. No.967   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 13, 2009

  • From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 15, 2009

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 22, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 930.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 1, Excused: 2.)
  • To printer.

May 23, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To committee.

May 26, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 967.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 967 concurred in. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 30, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 377.
  • Sections 106.7, 106.9, 107.5, 109.5, and 110 of this act effective May 30, 2009. Sections 1 to 1.8, inclusive, 27.5, 28, 28.5, 107, 108, and 109 of this act effective July 1, 2009. Sections 1.85, 1.9, and 1.95 of this act become effective July 1, 2009, if and only if no other bill passed during the 2009 Legislative Session becomes effective that provides for the appointment, powers, and duties of the Nevada Energy Commissioner. Section 106.5 of this act effective July 1, 2011. Sections 28, 28.5, and 106.5 of this act expire by limitation June 30, 2049.