SB397
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2009.
By: Commerce and Labor

Establishes provisions relating to the use of certain plastic bags. (BDR 40-1143)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 08, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce and Labor     Apr. 10, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.427   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 24, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 21, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 427.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 22, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 02, 2009

  • (No further action taken.)