AB535
Introduced in the Assembly on Apr 09, 2009.
By: Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments

Makes various changes relating to the Legislature and the Legislative Counsel Bureau. (BDR 17-957)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 348.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr. 07, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments     Apr. 23, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 13, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May. 14, 2009     01:30 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 05   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 22   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.573     Amend. No.707   

Bill History

Apr 09, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer.

Apr 10, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

May 01, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 02, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 573.) To printer.

May 04, 2009

May 05, 2009

May 06, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 21, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 707.) To printer.

May 22, 2009

May 23, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 707 concurred in. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 29, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 348.
  • Sections 11.2, 11.4, 11.6, 13.5, and 15 of this act effective May 29, 2009. Sections 1 to 11, inclusive, and 12, 13, and 14 of this act effective July 1, 2009. Section 14 of this act expires by limitation July 1, 2013.