AB46
Introduced in the Assembly on Dec 06, 2008.
By: Judiciary

Makes various changes concerning the right of certain persons to purchase or possess a firearm. (BDR 14-271)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 444.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 20, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 03, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May. 01, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     May. 07, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May. 26, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Do not recede

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 17   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 18   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.213     Amend. No.621     Amend. No.CA6   

Bill History

Dec 06, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Dec 07, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 16, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 213.) To printer.

Apr 17, 2009

Apr 20, 2009

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 15, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 16, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 621.) To printer.

May 18, 2009

May 19, 2009

  • In Assembly.

May 20, 2009

  • Senate Amendment No. 621 not concurred in. To Senate.
  • In Senate.

May 26, 2009

  • Senate Amendment No. 621 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.

May 27, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.

May 29, 2009

  • From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 621 and further amend. Conference report adopted by Assembly.

May 30, 2009

  • Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • To printer.

May 31, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 444.
  • Effective January 1, 2010.