AB1
Introduced in the Assembly on Nov 20, 2008.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Stewart

Prohibits certain demonstrations at a funeral, memorial service or ceremony. (BDR 15-150)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Feb. 18, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr. 10, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Nov 20, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nov 21, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 22, 2009

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)