SB77
Introduced in the Senate on Dec 15, 2008.
By: Health and Education

Provides for the establishment of programs of teen mentoring in public high schools. (BDR 34-696)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 180.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Mar. 04, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 04, 2009     03:30 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Education     Mar. 18, 2009     11:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Education     Apr. 15, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Education     May. 06, 2009     03:45 PM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Education     May. 16, 2009     12:22 PM    Minutes          Concur
  Senate Health and Education     May. 20, 2009     02:15 PM    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Health and Education     May. 27, 2009 Upon Adjournment    Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     May. 29, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          After Passage Discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar. 24   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 13   Yea 37,   Nay 3,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.614   

Bill History

Dec 15, 2008

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Education. To printer.

Dec 17, 2008

  • From printer.

Feb 02, 2009

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 19, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 23, 2009

  • Read second time.

Mar 24, 2009

Mar 27, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 12, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 614.) To printer.

May 13, 2009

May 15, 2009

  • In Senate.

May 18, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 614 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 19, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 22, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 180.
  • Effective May 22, 2009.